Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Castellanos, Jessica, Chicas, Martha, Hayes, Anthony, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hoer, Daniel A., against Does 1 To 20, Krummel, Kimberly Johnson, Krummel, Matthew, represented by Bjonerud, Deborah Tomi, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Suzanne Ramos Bolanos presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions546 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
This complaint is a proof of service of summons document in a legal case. The plaintiff, Jessica Castellanos, is serving the defendant, Matthew Krummel, with various documents including the summons, complaint, alternative dispute resolution package, ...
MINUTES FOR MAY-26-2021 9:00 AM
Date: May 26, 2021ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL.
Date: June 03, 2022MINUTES FOR MAY-25-2021 1:30 PM
Date: May 25, 2021ORDER RE REMOTE TRIAL (TRANSACTION 66627713)
Date: May 24, 2021MINUTES FOR MAY-18-2021 9:00 AM
Date: May 18, 2021MINUTES FOR MAY-13-2021 1:30 PM
Date: May 13, 2021MINUTES FOR MAY-21-2021 1:30 PM
Date: May 21, 2021MINUTES FOR MAY-24-2021 1:30 PM
Date: May 24, 2021ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: December 29, 2020MINUTES FOR MAY-12-2021 3:00 PM
Date: May 12, 2021ORDER RE EXTENSION TO ENTER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664 (TRANSACTION 66711196)
Date: June 23, 2021MINUTES FOR SEP-29-2020 9:30 AM
Date: September 29, 2020JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: June 04, 2021DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66074635) AS TO DEFENDANT KRUMMEL, MATTHEW
Date: November 02, 2020JURY NOTES RECEIVED DURING DELIBERATION
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: June 04, 2021MINUTES FOR OCT-01-2020 9:00 AM
Date: October 01, 2020MINUTES FOR OCT-06-2020 9:30 AM
Date: October 06, 2020WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: June 04, 2021MINUTES FOR JUN-03-2021 9:00 AM
Date: June 03, 2021MINUTES FOR JUN-02-2021 9:00 AM
Date: June 02, 2021JURY NOTES RECEIVED DURING TRIAL
Date: June 04, 2021MINUTES FOR JUN-04-2021 9:00 AM
Date: June 04, 2021MINUTES FOR JUN-01-2021 9:00 AM
Date: June 01, 2021MINUTES FOR MAY-27-2021 9:00 AM
Date: May 27, 2021MINUTES FOR MAY-28-2021 9:00 AM
Date: May 28, 2021MINUTES FOR AUG-19-2020 10:00 AM
Date: August 19, 2020ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: March 17, 2020MINUTES FOR SEP-23-2020 9:30 AM
Date: September 23, 2020MINUTES FOR AUG-31-2020 1:00 PM
Date: August 31, 2020MINUTES FOR AUG-26-2020 10:30 AM
Date: August 26, 2020TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 65865038) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAYES, ANTHONY AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: August 20, 2020ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: June 21, 2019WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 65865038) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAYES, ANTHONY AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: August 20, 2020ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: October 30, 2019NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL. (TRANSACTION ID # 67723174) FILED BY DEFENDANT KRUMMEL, KIMBERLY JOHNSON | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL. | |
June 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Plaintiffs' Notice Of Motion; Motion For Relief From Dismissal; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof; Declaration Of Dayna Ellsworth
Judge: SUZANNE R. BOLANOS |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-03-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, PLAINTIFF MARTHA CHICAS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL IS DENIED. (SEE MINI MINUTES FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) ORDER IS SIGNED. JUDGE: SUZANNE BOLANOS, CLERK: W. TRUPEK; NOT REPORTED (302/SRB) | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE (TRANSACTION ID # 67673524) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHICAS, MARTHA | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY DEBORAH BJONERUD IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 67642042) (TRANSACTION ID # 67642042) FILED BY DEFENDANT KRUMMEL, KIMBERLY JOHNSON | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 67642042) (TRANSACTION ID # 67642042) FILED BY DEFENDANT KRUMMEL, KIMBERLY JOHNSON | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF DAYNA ELLSWORTH, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 67596917) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHICAS, MARTHA HEARING SET FOR JUN-03-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY DEFENDANT KRUMMEL, MATTHEW KRUMMEL, KIMBERLY JOHNSON FEE DEPOSITED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY FOR JURY FEE FOR MAY-26-2022 THROUGH JUN-04-2022 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 502 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.