Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Green, Deanna, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Cattermole, Gregory Charles, against City And County Of San Francsico, City & County Of San Francisco, Does 1 To 30, Friends Of Youngblood Coleman Park, San Francisco Parks Alliance, (total of 6) See All represented by Burke, Michael S, Johnson, Sheila S., Whitman, Esq., Christopher B, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Non-Vehicle Related |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 11, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100064426) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO PARKS ALLIANCE
Date: February 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-14-2022 CONTINUED TO AUG-16-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, AND SAN FRANCISCO RECREATION AND PARKS DEPARTMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED AS TO FRIENDS OF YOUNGBLOOD COLEMAN PARK BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUN-14-2022 AT 10:30 AM. THIS DISMISSAL IS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 583.250 FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH C.C.P. 583.210. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 14, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-14-2022 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
March 08, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-08-2022 CONTINUED TO JUN-14-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) FRIENDS OF YOUNGBLOOD COLEMAN PARK; OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) FRIENDS OF YOUNGBLOOD COLEMAN PARK, AND CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. ***NOTICE: IMPENDING MANDATORY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 583.210 AND SECTION 583.250.*** NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 21, 2021 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-21-2021 CONTINUED TO MAR-08-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) FRIENDS OF YOUNGBLOOD COLEMAN PARK; OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) FRIENDS OF YOUNGBLOOD COLEMAN PARK, AND CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCSICO. ***NOTICE: IMPENDING MANDATORY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 583.210 AND SECTION 583.250.*** NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 21, 2021 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.