Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mims, Anna, Vazquez, Raul, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bravo, Joseph K., Dubrovsky, Anna, Ladva, Ashwin V., against City And County Of San Francisco, Does 1 To 10, San Francisco Municipal Transit, represented by Whitman, Esq., Christopher B, Zimmerman, Ian Paul, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time585 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons document in a legal case. It states that the plaintiff, Raul Vazquez, served the City and County of San Francisco with the summons, civil case cover sheet, complaint, and notice to plaintiff. The servic...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 07, 2018NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67180849) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIMS, ANNA
Date: December 20, 2021ORDER DENYING CITY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2021ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE A161397 DIV 3
Date: February 24, 2021DEFENDANT(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR PATRICK BRENNEN STREB.
Date: January 17, 2019PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR ROBERT STEPHEN NIEMANN.
Date: January 17, 2019ARBITRATOR UNABLE TO SERVE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: February 04, 2019PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR DENNIS CLARK BIRKHIMER.
Date: February 14, 2019PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE FEB-21-2019.
Date: February 08, 2019DEFENDANT(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR ROGER STONE REYNOLDS.
Date: February 14, 2019AWARD FILED BY ARBITRATOR
Date: May 14, 2019PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE JAN-17-2019.
Date: January 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | BALANCE OF THE CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUN-14-2022 AT 10:31 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 14, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-14-2022 10:31 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT COMPLAINT BY ANNA MIMS ONLY (ORIGNATING CASE NO. CGC-18-572263) (TRANSACTION ID # 67469691) | |
February 14, 2022 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-14-2022 - CASE SETTLED. NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANNA MIMS ON 12/20/21. JOINT CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF RENITA WOODS AND DEFENDANT CCSF FILED 3/17/21. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JUN-14-2022 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67180849) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIMS, ANNA | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT BY CATHY YAMAWAKI ONLY (CGC-18-570306) (TRANSACTION ID # 66852742) | |
June 14, 2021 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.