Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Held, Anthony E., filed a(n) Injunctive Relief case represented by Paras, Laralei S., against Tractor Supply Company, represented by Belzer, Aaron, Connolly, Jay William, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeri L. Jackson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2018 |
CategoryInjunctive Relief |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time182 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons document in a legal case. The plaintiff, Anthony E. Held, Ph.D., P.E., is suing the defendant, Tractor Supply Company. The case number is CGG-18-566691. The document indicates that the summons and other...
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT
Date: October 22, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62598412)
Date: October 25, 2018NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62683242) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E. PH.D., P.E. JURY DEMANDED | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-05-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62598412) | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 62598412) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E. PH.D., P.E. | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62598412) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E. PH.D., P.E. | |
October 24, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT | |
October 22, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And Consent Judgment
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: PURSUANT TO TERMS OF PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.