Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lanuza, Magdalena, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Blumenthal, Norman B, against Accentcare Home Health Of California, Inc., Accentcare Home Health Of California, Inc., A, Accentcare, Inc., Accentcare Inc., A Corporation, Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, (total of 5) See All represented by Kane, Robert J., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2018 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time317 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case. The plaintiff, Magdalena Lanuza, is suing AccentCare, Inc. et al. The document states that the person serving the summons was at least 18 years old and not a party to the actio...
ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: January 23, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62948954)
Date: February 07, 2019NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 04, 2018THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: PAGA SETTLEMENT DETAILS SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: February 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2019 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-06-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62948954) | |
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: PAGA SETTLEMENT DETAILS SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT | |
January 04, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Paga Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF MAGDALENA LANUZA'S MOTION TO APPROVE PAGA SETTLEMENT. PLAINTIFF MAGDALENA LANUZA'S MOTION "FOR AN ORDER APPROVING THE SETTLEMENT OF THE PAGA CLAIM ALLEGED AGAINST DEFENDANTS ACCENTCARE, INC. AND ACCENTCARE HOME HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC'.IN ACCORDANCE WITH LABOR CODE 2699(L)" IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION WAS FILED. I NOTE THAT, IN THE (OPERATIVE) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, MS. LANUZA SUED SOLELY "ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL" AND PLED NO INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS. THUS, THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS EXPRESSLY REQUESTED IN THE NOTICE OF MOTION; THAT NOTICE DOES NOT MENTION MS. LANUZA'S INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS, OVER WHICH I APPEAR TO HAVE NO JURISDICTION.MOVING PARTY TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED ORDER THAT IS VERBATIM WITH THE COURT'S RULING. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR#8600, MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM, REPORTED. =(302/RBU) | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-04-2019 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF MAGDALENA LANUZA'S MOTION TO APPROVE PAGA SETTLEMENT. PLAINTIFF MAGDALENA LANUZA'S MOTION "FOR AN ORDER APPROVING THE SETTLEMENT OF THE PAGA CLAIM ALLEGED AGAINST DEFENDANTS ACCENTCARE, INC. AND ACCENTCARE HOME HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC'.IN ACCORDANCE WITH LABOR CODE §2699(L)" IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION WAS FILED. I NOTE THAT, IN THE (OPERATIVE) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, MS. LANUZA SUED SOLELY "ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL" AND PLED NO INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS. THUS, THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS EXPRESSLY REQUESTED IN THE NOTICE OF MOTION; THAT NOTICE DOES NOT MENTION MS. LANUZA'S INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS, OVER WHICH I APPEAR TO HAVE NO JURISDICTION.MOVING PARTY TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED ORDER THAT IS VERBATIM WITH THE COURT'S RULING. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR#8600, MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM, REPORTED. =(302/RBU) | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FILE & SERVEXPRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 62756245) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LANUZA, MAGDALENA AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ON BEHALF OF ALL PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED LANUZA, MAGDALENA ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.