Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City And County Of San Francisco, The People Of The State Of California, Doe One Through Doe Fifty, Inclusive, Lee, Melvin, Mel Lee Management, Inc., (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints (For Unlawful And Unfair Buisness Practices) case represented by Choi, Jennifer, Ryan, Megan E., against Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Lee, Melvin, Mel Lee Management, Inc., San Francisco Care Center, L.P., Van Ness Care Center, Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Fellner, Jason E., Gruber, Aaron R., Millstein, David J, Pacheco, Anthony, Landry, Michelle L, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Curtis E.A. Karnow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2018 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints (For Unlawful And Unfair Buisness Practices) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by Van Ness Care Center, Inc. and San Francisco Care Center, L.P. against the City and County of San Francisco. The cross-complainants allege that the City and County of San Francisco breached a Disposition a...
ORDER GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: May 28, 2020ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: August 15, 2019ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: May 22, 2019ORDER RE DEFENDANT TERESA WONG'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR SANCTIONS
Date: June 12, 2019ORDER RE DEFENDANT MELVIN LEE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SANCTIONS
Date: May 29, 2019DEFENDANT'S DISPUTED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS: JEAN PIERRE LOMONACO AND COURT RULINGS
Date: August 18, 2022ORDER STIPULATED ADMITTED EXHIBITS; AND ORDER
Date: August 09, 2022MINUTES FOR AUG-09-2022 9:00 AM
Date: August 09, 2022ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER NO.4 (TRANSACTION #67827711)
Date: July 15, 2022MINUTES FOR APR-22-2022 9:00 AM
Date: April 22, 2022ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL [TRANSACTION NO. 67319119]
Date: February 15, 2022MINUTES FOR FEB-14-2022 9:00 AM
Date: February 14, 2022ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION #67501840)
Date: April 22, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67308237) FILED BY DEFENDANT WONG, TERESA AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: February 10, 2022MINUTES FOR FEB-09-2022 3:30 PM
Date: February 09, 2022MINUTES FOR FEB-07-2022 4:00 PM
Date: February 07, 2022MINUTES FOR FEB-03-2022 9:00 AM
Date: February 03, 2022ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME (TRANSACTION #67288828)
Date: February 03, 2022ORDER GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: April 13, 2021ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: September 01, 2020ORDER ; DISCOVERY ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)
Date: August 11, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 64737349) FILED BY ATTORNEY FELLNER, JASON E.
Date: February 18, 2020ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: February 28, 2019ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER.
Date: January 30, 2019ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING SPECIALLY SET SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 14, 2019ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: January 30, 2019NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 23, 2018ORDER RE DEFENSE COUNSEL MOTION TO WITHDRAW (TRANSACTION #67284897)
Date: February 02, 2022NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRETRIAL HEARING (TRANSACTION #67284897)
Date: February 02, 2022MINUTES FOR NOV-17-2021 1:30 PM
Date: November 17, 2021ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION #67023979)
Date: October 18, 2021MINUTES FOR DEC-13-2021 2:00 PM
Date: December 13, 2021ORDER RE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER #2
Date: November 22, 2021ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER NO.3 (TRANSACTION #67168119)
Date: December 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Hearing | COURT TRIAL | |
August 23, 2022 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-22-2022 CONTINUED TO AUG-23-2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 611 | |
August 22, 2022 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
August 19, 2022 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-19-2022 CONTINUED TO AUG-22-2022 AT 10:00 AM IN 611 | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S DISPUTED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS: JEAN PIERRE LOMONACO AND COURT RULINGS | |
August 18, 2022 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-18-2022 CONTINUED TO AUG-19-2022 AT 10:00 AM IN 611 | |
August 17, 2022 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.