Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Shamoonnia, Synthia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Diamond, Stuart David, against Does 1 To 50, Sun, Wen Xio, Zhang, Shuying, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 07, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions75 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time135 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case. It states that the plaintiff, Synthia Shamoonnia, served copies of various documents, including the Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint, Summons, Notice to Plaintiff, and ADR Inf...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-08-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100037879) | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100036984) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHAMOONNIA, SYNTHIA | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033472), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHAMOONNIA, SYNTHIA SERVED MAR-11-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SUN, WEN XIO | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHAMOONNIA, SYNTHIA AS TO DEFENDANT ZHANG, SHUYING SUN, WEN XIO DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-08-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-07-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-16-2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.