Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
O'Connor, John D., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kirk, Jeffrey David, against Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Murphy Pearson Bradley & Feeney, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 05, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions74 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time137 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-08-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62045715) | |
May 02, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Hearing On Application For Right To Attach Order And Order For Issuance Of Writ Of Attachment Matter on calendar for Wednesday, May 2, 2018, Line 14, PLAINTIFF JOHN O'CONNOR'S Notice Of Hear...
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
May 02, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice Of Hearing On Application For Right To Attach Order And Order For Issuance Of Writ Of Attachment
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-02-2018 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, PLAINTIFF JOHN O'CONNOR'S HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT IS OFF CALENDAR. A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT WAS FILED WITH THE COURT. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR., CLERK: M. GOODMAN, COURT REPORTER: CHRISTINE JORDAN, CSR#12262, CJORDAN@SFTC.ORG, REPORTED. (D302/RBU) | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61958204) FILED BY PLAINTIFF O'CONNOR, JOHN D. | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61873713) FILED BY PLAINTIFF O'CONNOR, JOHN D. | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JOHN D. OCONNOR IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61873713) FILED BY PLAINTIFF O'CONNOR, JOHN D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.