Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alioto, Angela, Angela Alioto For Mayor 2018, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Dhillon, Harmeet K., against Does 1-10 Inclusive, Leno, Mark, Mark Leno For Mayor 2018,, Phelham, Leeann, Rosenfield, Ben, (total of 5) See All represented by Kaufman, Stephen J., Shen, Andrew N., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2018 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions29 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time132 days |
This complaint document is filed by Harmeet Dhillon, an attorney from the Dhillon Law Group Inc., on behalf of the plaintiff/petitioner Angela Alioto and others. The case number is CGC - 18-563628. The defendant/respondent is Leeann Pelham, along wit...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 11, 2018ORDER DENYING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)
Date: January 19, 2018DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18039008)
Date: February 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-13-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 18039008) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALIOTO, ANGELA , AN INDIVIDUAL ANGELA ALIOTO FOR MAYOR 2018 A POLITICAL CAMPAIGN ORGANIZATION | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18039008) | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18037038), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALIOTO, ANGELA , AN INDIVIDUAL ANGELA ALIOTO FOR MAYOR 2018 A POLITICAL CAMPAIGN ORGANIZATION SERVED JAN-31-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-01-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT ROSENFIELD, BEN , IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CONTROLLER FOR THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18037038), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALIOTO, ANGELA , AN INDIVIDUAL ANGELA ALIOTO FOR MAYOR 2018 A POLITICAL CAMPAIGN ORGANIZATION SERVED JAN-31-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-01-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT PHELHAM, LEEANN , IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE SAN FRANCISCO ETHICS COMMISSION | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED FEB-01-2018, SERVED JAN-12-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 18031026) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANGELA ALIOTO FOR MAYOR 2018 A POLITICAL CAMPAIGN ORGANIZATION AS TO DEFENDANT MARK LENO FOR MAYOR 2018, A POLITICAL CAMPAIGN ORGANIZATION | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS) | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - DENIED. ORDER SIGNED. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR., CLERK: M. GOODMAN, COURT REPORTER: MITCH LYON, CSR#6840, MLYON@SFTC.ORG, REPORTED. (D302/RBU) | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF STEPHEN J. KAUFMAN IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION OF RESPONDENTS MARK LENO AND MARK LENO FOR ASSEMBLY 2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 61580660) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARK LENO FOR MAYOR 2018, A POLITICAL CAMPAIGN ORGANIZATION LENO, MARK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.