Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Oung, Caroline, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Biddle, Alexander Michael, Rosenberg, Patricia G, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or, Connell, Stephen, Connell, Susan R., Does 1 Through 100, O'Toole, James J., (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2018 |
CategoryQuiet Title - Real Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff, Caroline Oung, is suing the defendants, Stephen Connell, Susan Connell, et al, in case number CGC-18-563589. The document is a notic...
PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67476928) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OUNG, CAROLINE
Date: April 13, 2022RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 67336054) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OUNG, CAROLINE
Date: February 22, 2022RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 67167126) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OUNG, CAROLINE
Date: December 14, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67050240) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OUNG, CAROLINE
Date: October 27, 2021RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 66349154) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OUNG, CAROLINE
Date: February 17, 2021ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS (COPY IN SASE)
Date: March 19, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 10, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF OUNG, CAROLINE
Date: February 07, 2018RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 63010179) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OUNG, CAROLINE
Date: February 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67861953) | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF OUNG, CAROLINE RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CONNELL, STEPHEN CONNELL, SUSAN R. THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF THE DECEASED GEORGE H CONNELL, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE TO THE PROPERTY SEE SCANNED DOC - (1) THE DEED TO THE SUBJECT PROPERTY COMMONLY KNOW AS 245-249A EUREKA STREET, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA IS REVISED SUCH THAT THE LEGAL DESCRIPTION NOW INCLUDES THE FOLLOWING TO STATE: "COMMENCING AT A POINT ON THE EASTERLY LINE OF EUREKA STREET, DISTANT THERERON TWO HUNDRED FORTY-FIVE (245) FEET FROM THE NORTHLY LINE OF 20TH STREET; RUNNING THENCE NORTHLY AND ALONG SAID LINE OF EUREKA STREET, THIRTY (30) FEET; THENCE AT A RIGHT ANGLE EASTERLY ONE HUNDRED AND TWENTY-FIVE (125) FEET; THENCE AT A RIGHT ANGLE SOUTHERLY THIRTY (30) FEET; THENCE AT A RIGHT ANGLE WESTERLY ONE HUNDRED AND TWENTY-FIVE (125) TO THE POINT OF COMMENCEMENT; (2) TITLE IS QUIETED IN CAROLINE OUNG TO THE SUBJECT PROPERTY AS DESCRIBED ABOVE IN THE REFORMED DEED; AND (3) DECLARATORY RELIEF IS GRANTED THAT CAROLINE OUNG IS THE SOLE OWNER OF THE OMITTED AREA REFERENCED ABOVE IN THE REFORMED DEED TO THE SUBJECT PROPERTY. | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF MAY-31-2022, NOTICE OF HEARING ON JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - GRANTED. PROPOSED JUDGMENT WAS SUBMITTED TO AND SIGNED BY THE COURT. NO APPEARANCE. NOT REPORTED. JUDGE: MICHELLE TONG. CLERK: K. DOUGHERTY. (D514) | |
July 12, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-12-2022 CONTINUED TO SEP-27-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) JAMES J. O'TOOLE, AND MARILYN B. O'TOOLE; OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) SUSAN R. CONNELL, AND JAMES J. O'TOOLE, AND MARILYN B. O'TOOLE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 67741972) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OUNG, CAROLINE | |
June 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice Of Hearing On Judgment By Default And Stipulation
Judge: MURLENE J. RANDLE |
|
May 31, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice Of Hearing On Judgment By Default And Stipulation
Judge: MICHELLE TONG |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF MAY-31-2022 NOTICE OF HEARING ON JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AND STIPULATION TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAY-31-2022 BY MICHELLE TONG. COUNSEL WILL SUBMIT STIPULATED JUDGMENTS FOR THE COURT'S APPROVAL UPON REVIEW. JUDGE: MICHELLE TONG; CLERK: R. SAHATJIAN. COURT REPORTER ROBIN CASILLAS CSR14042. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.