Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chiapelone, Anthony, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Peterson, Peter Kurt, against Chiapelone, Steven, Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 19, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions217 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a declaration by Michael S. Pecherer, a referee in a partition action involving a single-family residence in San Francisco. The plaintiff owns approximately 95% of the residence, while the defendant owns approximately 5%. The defend...
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200020735)
Date: December 03, 2020FINAL REPORT OF REFEREE (TRANSACTION ID # 100111719) FILED BY OTHER PECHERER, MICHAEL S. (REFEREE)
Date: September 17, 2020ORDER AUTHORIZING TRANSFER OF FUNDS HELD BY REFEREE TO FAMILY TRUST
Date: August 10, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 19, 2017CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100057871) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHIAPELONE, ANTHONY
Date: December 31, 2018ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S PERSONAL PROPERTY REMAINING AT RESIDENCE
Date: July 25, 2019ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S PERSONAL PROPERTY REMAINING AT RESIDENCE
Date: October 07, 2019CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64354105) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHIAPELONE, ANTHONY
Date: October 25, 2019ORDER CONFIRMING THE SALE OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: January 13, 2020ORDER MODIFYING DISTRIBUTION ORDER OF FEBRUARY 7, 2020
Date: February 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-30-2020 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200020735) | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: FINAL JUDGMENT OF PARTITION AND DISCHARGE OF REFEREE. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
September 30, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL REPORT OF REFEREE (TRANSACTION ID # 100111719) FILED BY OTHER PECHERER, MICHAEL S. (REFEREE) | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-30-2020 CONTINUED TO DEC-30-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF FINAL JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTHORIZING TRANSFER OF FUNDS HELD BY REFEREE TO FAMILY TRUST | |
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-15-2020 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 | |
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, REFEREE'S MOTION FOR ORDER RELATING TO THE DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO THE REQUESTED DISTRIBUTION OF THE SALE PROCEEDS TO THE FAMILY TRUST ACCOUNT MAINTAINED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE DEFENDANT. MOTION IS OTHERWISE DENIED. JUDGE: CHARLES F. HAINES; CLERK: J. MURPHY; NOT REPORTED. (501) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.