Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Align Technology, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cook, David Julian, against Does I Through X, And Each Of Them, Inclusive, Lambert, Nicole, represented by Walker, Lorna, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel K. Feng Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions127 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case between ALIGN TECHNOLOGY, INC. and NICOLE LAMBERT. The document indicates that the plaintiff's attorney, David J. Cook, served copies of the summons, complaint, alternative disp...
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT
Date: November 18, 2019NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-03-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66739232) | |
May 04, 2021 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-04-2021 CONTINUED TO AUG-03-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 02, 2021 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-02-2021 CONTINUED TO MAY-04-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 08, 2020 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-08-2020 CONTINUED TO FEB-02-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.