Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cajina, Melba, filed a(n) Products Liability case represented by Cajina, Fulvio F., against New Flyer Industries, Electric Transit, Inc., Does 1 To 10, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2017 |
CategoryProducts Liability |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time559 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING APR-09-2019 AT 10:30 AM. THIS DISMISSAL IS PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 09, 2019 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-09-2019 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-29-2019 CONTINUED TO APR-09-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S); PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 29, 2019 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-29-2019 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $400.00 AGAINST FULVIO F. CAJINA, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: NOV-27-2018, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE DEC-13-2018. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. [VACATED PER COURT'S ORAL ORDER AT THE 4-09-19 OSC HEARING.] | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-27-2018 CONTINUED TO JAN-29-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 27, 2018 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-27-2018 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.