Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Columbia Property Trust, Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc., De Guzman, Marie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Reed, Nikolaus W., against Columbia Property Trust, Crown Building Maintenance Co., Does 1 To 50, Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc., represented by Bremer, Keith G., Hurley, Alison K., O'Hara, Brian C., Sturmer, Debra Steel, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Non-Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions608 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Case Cycle Time673 days |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 100026770) FILED BY ATTORNEY O'HARA, BRIAN C.
Date: November 21, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF DE GUZMAN, MARIE
Date: October 23, 2017ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION
Date: August 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | BALANCE OF CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUL-09-2019 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 09, 2019 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-09-2019 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
June 03, 2019 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
May 16, 2019 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SETTLEMENT ATTORNEY 1 |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-03-2019 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JUL-09-2019 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-16-2019 - NOT HELD AND REMOVED (0.5) | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100070934) | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - UNCONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100070596) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DE GUZMAN, MARIE | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-16-2019 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER REBECCA GREY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.