Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vinocur, Laurence, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Chanler, Clifford A, against Does 1 To 150, Rustico Llc, represented by Rothschild, Brian M., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeri L. Jackson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time280 days |
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT
Date: May 18, 2018NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 16, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62057204)
Date: May 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-13-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 62057204) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VINOCUR, LAURENCE | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62057204) | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62057204) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VINOCUR, LAURENCE | |
May 18, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And Consent Judgement As To Defendant Rustico Llc Matter on calendar for Friday, May 18, 2018, Line 9, PLAINTIFF LAURENCE VINOCUR Motio...
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT | |
May 18, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And Consent Judgement As To Defendant Rustico Llc
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-18-2018 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF LAURENCE VINOCUR'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT RUSTICO LLC. IS GRANTED. ORDER AND JUGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: RICHARD ULMER; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR #8600 (302/RBU) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.