Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Calloway, Annette Rutland, Calloway, Wallace, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bassi, Michael B, against And All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Interest In, Francis, Janisa, Francis, Janisa R., Reed, Latara, Reed, Latara R, (total of 5) See All represented by Wood, Gregory J., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 14, 2017 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions184 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time340 days |
NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-27-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.
Date: January 19, 2018NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2018 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
August 27, 2018 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-27-2018 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 2/14/18. (206) | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61717590) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALLOWAY, WALLACE CALLOWAY, ANNETTE RUTLAND | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT / UNCONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 61690246) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALLOWAY, WALLACE CALLOWAY, ANNETTE RUTLAND | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS (TRANSACTION ID # 61690246) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALLOWAY, WALLACE CALLOWAY, ANNETTE RUTLAND | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61690246) | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-27-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. | |
January 17, 2018 | Hearing |
OBJECTION HEARING CALENDAR
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
January 17, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.