Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City And County Of San Francisco, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Herrera, Dennis Jose, against Cim Commercial Trust Corporation, Cim Merger Sub, Llc, Cim Urban Partners, L.P., Cim Urban Reit 211 Main Street Sf Lp, Cim Urban Reit Llc., (total of 9) See All represented by Marsh, Bradley R, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 06, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions102 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
|
Case Cycle Time225 days |
ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER
Date: July 17, 2017NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 06, 2017ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2017ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/PROHIBITION A152073 DIV 5
Date: August 24, 2017ORDER GRANTING REAL PARTY IN INTEREST'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE A152073 DIV 5
Date: August 24, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2017 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-06-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61125297) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61118071) | |
September 06, 2017 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/PROHIBITION A152073 DIV 5 | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING REAL PARTY IN INTEREST'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE A152073 DIV 5 | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-06-2017 CONTINUED TO DEC-06-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER AND STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING WRIT OF MANDAMUS (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS) | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING WRIT OF MANDAMUS (TRANSACTION ID # 60917625) FILED BY DEFENDANT CIM URBAN PARTNERS, L.P. CIM MERGER SUB, LLC CIM COMMERCIAL TRUST CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.