Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hammond Pond Parkway, Llc, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Zacks, Andrew Mayer, against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Hecker, Julia E., White, Adam, White, Josephine, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryQuiet Title - Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Case Cycle Time135 days |
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60561929)
Date: May 05, 2017NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 15, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2017 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-19-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60561929) | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60263830), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAMMOND POND PARKWAY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-23-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT WHITE, ADAM AN INDIVIDUAL | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60263830), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAMMOND POND PARKWAY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-24-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT WHITE, JOSEPHINE AN INDIVIDUAL | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60223924), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAMMOND POND PARKWAY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-15-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT HECKER, JULIA E. AN INDIVIDUAL | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAMMOND POND PARKWAY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT WHITE, ADAM AN INDIVIDUAL WHITE, JOSEPHINE AN INDIVIDUAL HECKER, JULIA E. AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-19-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-17-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-26-2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.