Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Silva, Edward, Silva, Evelyn, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ord, Edward O.C., against Franchise Tax Board, The California Franchise Tax Board, The State Of California, represented by Wang, Lucy F, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 27, 2018ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: March 21, 2019ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE PER STIPULATION
Date: August 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
September 28, 2022 | Hearing |
Amended Notice Of Hearing Of Motion By California Franchise Tax Board To Dismiss Action
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
August 23, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion By California Franchise Tax Board To Dismiss Action
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-23-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT THE CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD'S UNOPPOSED "MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION [CCP 583.310]" IS GRANTED. PREVAILING PARTY TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED ORDER THAT IS VERBATIM WITH THE SUBSTANTIVE PORTION OF THE COURT'S RULING. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR., CLERK: S. LE, NOT REPORTED. =(302/RBU) | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION BY CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD TO DISMISS ACTION, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100171358) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD HEARING SET FOR SEP-28-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD TO DISMISS ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100171160) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CARA M. PORTER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD TO DISMISS ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100171160) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD TO DISMISS ACTION, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100171160) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD HEARING SET FOR AUG-23-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
June 08, 2022 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.