Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Gizaw, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with A. James Robertson II presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2016 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions224 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time227 days |
This complaint is filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Daniel Gizaw and Does 1 to 10. The complaint is for common counts and seeks a demand amount of $9,396.03. The complaint alleges that the defendants were indebted to the plaintiff on an account...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2017 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-01-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60911916) | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-01-2017 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100026815) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT GIZAW, DANIEL DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-14-2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.