Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Singh, Ranjit, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brusil, Ilona, against Cu, Chanh, Does 1 To 20, Ryan, Robert Gillette, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2016 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1132 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED AS TO ENTIRE ACTION BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUN-14-2022 AT 10:30 AM. THIS DISMISSAL IS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 583.360 FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH C.C.P. 583.310. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 14, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-14-2022 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
March 08, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-08-2022 CONTINUED TO JUN-14-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) CHANH CU, AND DOES 1 TO 20. ***NOTICE: IMPENDING MANDATORY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 583.310 AND SECTION 583.360.*** NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 21, 2021 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-21-2021 CONTINUED TO MAR-08-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, OR DISMISS DEFENDANT(S) CHANH CU, AND DOES 1 TO 20. ***NOTICE: IMPENDING MANDATORY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 583.310 AND SECTION 583.360.*** NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 24, 2021 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-24-2021 CONTINUED TO DEC-21-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) CHANH CU. ***NOTICE: IMPENDING MANDATORY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 583.310 AND SECTION 583.360.*** NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 27, 2021 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.