Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pennypacker, Matthew, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hooshmand, Mark, against Does 1 Through 10, Yuen, Amy, Yuen, Dennis, represented by Nozzolino, Maria, Reilly, Davis J., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with TERI L. JACKSON presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 23, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions519 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time537 days |
This complaint is a first amended complaint for damages filed by Matthew Pennypacker against defendants Dennis Yuen, Amy Yuen, and Does 1 through 10. The plaintiff, Matthew Pennypacker, is an individual living in San Francisco, California. The defend...
MINUTES FOR MAY-10-2018 10:30 AM
Date: May 10, 2018MINUTES FOR JUN-29-2018 9:00 AM
Date: June 29, 2018JURY INSTRUCTIONS - GIVEN TO THE JURY
Date: May 14, 2018EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: May 09, 2018EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: May 09, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63078696) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: March 18, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63116468) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: March 29, 2019WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: May 09, 2018MINUTES FOR MAR-12-2019 10:30 AM
Date: March 12, 2019JURY NOTES RECEIVED DURING TRIAL
Date: May 03, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-07-2018 9:30 AM
Date: May 07, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63064888) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: March 13, 2019MINUTES FOR MAY-08-2018 10:30 AM
Date: May 08, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-02-2018 9:45 AM
Date: May 02, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63040759) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: March 07, 2019DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE (MODIFIED IN OPEN COURT)
Date: April 30, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61970603) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: April 30, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61613135) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: January 25, 2018MINUTES FOR APR-26-2018 8:30 AM
Date: April 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60997534) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: August 17, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60997527) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: August 17, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60101713) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, DENNIS YUEN, AMY
Date: January 20, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60404514) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: March 30, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59925702) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: December 07, 2016NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 23, 2016MINUTES FOR APR-23-2018 9:30 AM
Date: April 23, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61952214) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: April 24, 2018MINUTES FOR APR-24-2018 9:00 AM
Date: April 24, 2018EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 61920169) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, DENNIS YUEN, AMY
Date: April 16, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61908277) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: April 11, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61876894)
Date: April 04, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61687275) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: February 13, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68333718) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: November 01, 2022PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69086174) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: February 06, 2023MINUTES FOR APR-30-2018 8:30 AM
Date: April 30, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 68271751) FILED BY ATTORNEY REILLY, DAVIS J.
Date: October 18, 2022MINUTES FOR MAY-03-2018 9:00 AM
Date: May 03, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64050688) FILED BY APPELLANT PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: August 02, 2019MINUTES FOR MAY-24-2023 2:00 PM
Date: May 24, 2023MINUTES FOR MAR-16-2023 10:00 AM
Date: March 16, 2023DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 69663094) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: March 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DENNIS YUEN AND AMY YUEN (TRANSACTION ID # 62905715)
Date: January 28, 2019PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62987363) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: February 20, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62991571) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, DENNIS YUEN, AMY
Date: February 21, 2019PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62987388) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: February 20, 2019REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A157985 DIV 2
Date: August 18, 2022REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A157680 DIV 2
Date: August 18, 2022CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: January 19, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62972333) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: February 14, 2019CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: MISSING DOCUMENTS
Date: June 18, 2020NOTICE RE: DEFAULT
Date: July 14, 2020NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT
Date: August 28, 2019NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: July 31, 2019CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF AMENDED APPEAL
Date: July 31, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62964020) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: February 13, 2019NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: June 26, 2019MINUTES FOR MAY-23-2019 2:00 PM
Date: May 23, 2019CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 26, 2019ORDER STIPULATED ORDER CONTINUING HEARING (TRANSACTION #63271888)
Date: May 15, 2019MINUTES FOR APR-19-2019 9:15 AM
Date: April 19, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63145804) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: April 08, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62916858) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW
Date: January 31, 2019JURY NOTES RECEIVED DURING DELIBERATIONS
Date: May 14, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-09-2018 9:30 AM
Date: May 09, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-14-2018 9:30 AM
Date: May 14, 2018JURY VERDICT
Date: May 14, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63498903)
Date: July 01, 2019ORDER RE PLAINTIFF MATTHEW PENNYPACKER MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL (TRANSACTION #63083307)
Date: March 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 | Hearing |
JURY TRIAL
Judge: SUZANNE R. BOLANOS |
|
September 20, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS
Judge: SUZANNE R. BOLANOS |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MEANS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTION 1010.6(E) AND (F) (TRANSACTION ID # 70358539) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, DENNIS YUEN, AMY | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 70358539) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, DENNIS YUEN, AMY | |
June 16, 2023 | Hearing |
JUDICIAL MEDIATION
Judge: JEFFREY S. ROSS |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR JUDICIAL MEDIATION HEARING SET FOR JUN-16-2023 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 502 | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL MEDIATION HELD AND DISCUSSIONS TO CONTINUE AT A TIME TO BE DETERMINED. JUDGE: JEFFREY S. ROSS; CLERK: NONE; NOT REPORTED. (502) | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100202489) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100202489) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100202284) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PENNYPACKER, MATTHEW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.