Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Agpme Tenant Llc,, Engage Hospitality Llc,, Engage With Sf Hospitality Llc,, Gajanan Inc., A California Corporation, Kph Management Llc,, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Lakritz, Thomas S, Silverstein, Amy L, against Cisneros, Jose, City And County Of San Francisco, Does 1 Through 50, Gajanan Inc., A California Corporation, represented by Lakritz, Thomas S, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Gail Dekreon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1190 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
|
This complaint document is a proof of service for a legal case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff is Gaianan Inc., a California Corporation, and Engage with SF Hospitality LLC, et al. The defendants are City a...
ORDER MODIFYING OPINION, BUT DOES NOT CHANGE JUDGMENT. A160539 DIV 2
Date: April 28, 2022ORDER GRANTING PUBLICAITON A160539 DIV 2
Date: April 25, 2022ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TAX COST
Date: November 25, 2020NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT
Date: July 08, 2020CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: August 03, 2020CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 10, 2020EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: May 22, 2019EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: May 22, 2019MINUTES FOR MAY-22-2019 9:30 AM
Date: May 22, 2019WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: May 22, 2019MINUTES FOR MAY-21-2019 9:30 AM
Date: May 21, 2019MINUTES FOR MAR-11-2019 10:00 AM
Date: March 11, 2019MINUTES FOR MAY-20-2019 9:30 AM
Date: May 20, 2019MINUTES FOR MAY-18-2018 9:00 AM
Date: May 18, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-15-2018 9:00 AM
Date: May 15, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-16-2018 9:00 AM
Date: May 16, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-17-2018 9:00 AM
Date: May 17, 2018MINUTES FOR MAR-15-2018 9:30 AM
Date: March 15, 2018MINUTES FOR MAR-19-2018 9:30 AM
Date: March 19, 2018ORDER AFTER HEARING OF MARCH 19, 2018
Date: March 21, 2018MINUTES FOR MAR-12-2018 1:30 PM
Date: March 12, 2018MINUTES FOR MAR-02-2018 1:30 PM
Date: March 02, 2018NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 16, 2016STIPULATION TO CONT TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Date: October 12, 2017ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE
Date: October 12, 2017ORDER GRANTING THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (AND JOSE CISNOEROS') MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: September 25, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61137317) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Date: September 19, 2017ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS
Date: March 09, 2018STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: December 23, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100097019)
Date: February 14, 2020ORDER ORDER AS TO AGPME TENANT LLC
Date: May 24, 2017ORDER ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT HOSPITALITY LLC
Date: May 24, 2017ORDER ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: May 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A160539 DIV 2 | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER MODIFYING OPINION, BUT DOES NOT CHANGE JUDGMENT. A160539 DIV 2 | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PUBLICAITON A160539 DIV 2 | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TAX COST | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TAX COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 66090326) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GAJANAN INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ENGAGE WITH SF HOSPITALITY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KPH MANAGEMENT LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-16-550351) ENGAGE HOSPITALITY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-16-550351) AGPME TENANT LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-16-550354) MANGAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-16-554304) LOMBARD HOSPITALITY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-16-554304) | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED PARTIALLY GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS RE: EXPERT WITNESS FEES INCURRED AFTER APRIL 1, 2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 65896303) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GAJANAN INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ENGAGE WITH SF HOSPITALITY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KPH MANAGEMENT LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-16-550351) ENGAGE HOSPITALITY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-16-550351) AGPME TENANT LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-16-550354) MANGAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-16-554304) LOMBARD HOSPITALITY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-16-554304) | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS RE: EXPERT WITNESS FEES INCURRED AFTER APRIL 1, 2018 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (CCP SECTION 1013A(4)) OF ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS RE: EXPERT WITNESS FEES INCURRED AFTER APRIL 1, 2018 | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $377.00 RE 36379 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO SILVERSTEIN & POMERANTZ, DOC#1910580067, WARRANT #38206411, DATED AUG-17-2020 | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $28.00 RE 36379 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO CSR MARIA TORREANO, DOC#1910580057, WARRANT #38206408, DATED AUG-17-2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.