Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Comcast Of California Iii, Inc., Frid, Aleksandr, Frid, Marina, Lui, Kam T., Lui, Paul H., (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Dolan, Christopher B., against At&T Corp., At&T, Services, Inc., Comcast Cable Communications, Llc, Comcast Corp., Comcast Of California Iii, Inc., (total of 13) See All represented by Bigley, Paul A., Montalvo, Jose A, Mullen, Robert Bernard, Picker, Esq., James R., Roth, David V., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 10, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions658 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
This complaint is a cross-complaint for indemnity filed by Paul H. Lui and Kam T. Lui, individually and as trustees of the Paul Ho-Chow & Kam Tai Lui Revocable Trust, in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The cross-complainant...
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: August 20, 2019ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: August 10, 2018MINUTES FOR AUG-06-2018 9:30 AM
Date: August 06, 2018NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-22-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.
Date: January 11, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 60051104) FILED BY ATTORNEY MONTALVO, JOSE A
Date: January 10, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59546200) FILED BY DEFENDANT WAVEDIVISION HOLDINGS, LLC
Date: September 12, 2016NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 10, 2016NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64769917) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESBORG, KARA L.
Date: February 27, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 01, 2018ORDER GRANTING WAVE DIVISION HOLDINGS, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 21, 2018ORDER FOR DEFENSE MENTAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 28, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62525736)
Date: October 05, 2018ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES
Date: January 17, 2019DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 65699196)
Date: June 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2020 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-17-2020 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PAUL A. BIGLEY FOR HEARING ON OSC (TRANSACTION ID # 200016976) FILED BY DEFENDANT COMCAST OF CALIFORNIA III, INC. | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY COMCAST OF CALIFORNIA III, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 200016730) | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-06-2020 CONTINUED TO NOV-17-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR COMCAST OF CALIFORNIA III, INC. TO DISMISS MOES 1-50 OF CROSS COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 65699196) | |
April 28, 2020 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-28-2020 CONTINUED TO OCT-06-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 09, 2020 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.