Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Shrestha, Ramesh, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Venardi, Mark, against Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Hotel Sunrise, Inc., Hotel Sunrise, Llc, Patel, Ketan, Patel, Kirit Kumal, (total of 8) See All represented by Baltazar, Ashley A., Feldman, Lori Beth, Rutherford, Luanne, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 01, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1190 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1219 days |
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE COSTS ENDORSED FILED COPY RETURNED IN SASE.
Date: January 25, 2019ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: August 29, 2017NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 01, 2016NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 62606387) FILED BY ATTORNEY FELDMAN, LORI BETH
Date: October 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-03-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 03, 2019 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-03-2019 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100088018) | |
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-04-2019 CONTINUED TO DEC-03-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 04, 2019 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-04-2019 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
February 11, 2019 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-11-2019 - CASE SETTLED. NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED 1/29/19. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JUN-04-2019 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
January 31, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion For Attorney Fees
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.