Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rogers, Brian F 24661 Amador Street, Apt., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Per, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Ingalls, Doran, Pacheco, Sean, Robert Half Corporation, Robert Half International, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Glatzer, Bonnie Allycee, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions125 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed by Brian F. Rogers against Robert Half Corporation. The complaint alleges racial discrimination in violation of California Government Code § 12940(a). The plaintiff, Brian F. Rogers, claims that he is an Afric...
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGERS, BRIAN F
Date: September 08, 2016ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITH LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: September 08, 2016NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 06, 2016CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGERS, BRIAN F JURY DEMANDED
Date: September 25, 2019CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE RESPONDENT'S MISSING DOCUMENTS
Date: January 03, 2018CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: March 01, 2018CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $415.00
Date: January 24, 2018CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE MISSING DOCUMENTS
Date: January 03, 2018CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 12, 2017NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT ROGERS, BRIAN F
Date: August 11, 2017DECLARATION OF BRIAN ROGERS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGERS, BRIAN F
Date: April 07, 2017POS OF OPPOS TO MTN FOR SUMM JUDGMNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGERS, BRIAN F
Date: April 07, 2017EVIDENCE IN OPPOS TO MTN FOR SUMM JUDGMNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGERS, BRIAN F
Date: April 07, 2017REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGERS, BRIAN F
Date: April 07, 2017MEMO IN OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR SUMM JUDGMNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGERS, BRIAN F
Date: April 07, 2017ORDER ORDER GRANTING IN PART DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: February 03, 2017ORDER ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: February 06, 2017ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT ROGERS, BRIAN F
Date: May 08, 2017REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A151655 DIV 3
Date: July 30, 2019ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S "MEMORANDUM OF COSTS"
Date: December 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-10-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 09, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ROGERS, BRIAN F TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL, INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-09-2020 CONTINUED TO FEB-10-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ***NOTE: PLEASE SUBMIT FORM OF JUDGMENT TO DEPT. 302, THE DEPARTMENT. THAT RULED ON THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.*** NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66118681) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL, INC. | |
June 10, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-10-2020 CONTINUED TO DEC-09-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 65654584) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL, INC. | |
April 08, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.