Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chung, In Bum, West Com 1520 Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pro Per, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Szeto, Kwok Hung, West Com 1520 Llc, West-Com 1520 Llc, represented by Bierer, Joel David, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Stephen M. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time506 days |
This complaint is filed by West Com 1520 LLC against In Bum Chung and other fictitiously named defendants. West Com 1520 LLC is the owner of a commercial property in San Francisco, CA. The property was leased to Chung for operating a fish and sushi r...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 10, 2016ORDER - EX PARTE ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL
Date: December 07, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100018207)
Date: June 30, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100018207) | |
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT CROSS COMPLAINANT WEST COM 1520 LLC RECOVER FROM CROSS DEFENDANT CHUNG, IN BUM $45,257.50 PRINCIPAL, $3,246.14 INTEREST, $1,729.05 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $50,232.69, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
June 19, 2017 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: STEPHEN M. MURPHY |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT WEST COM 1520 LLC | |
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-19-2017 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 514 | |
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL ON JUN-19-2017 OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ENTERED. JUDGE: STEPHEN M. MURPHY; CLERK: J. BERTELSEN; REPORTER: MITCH LYON, CSR#6840. (514) | |
June 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion To Continue Trial
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 05, 2017 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | MASTER CALENDAR MOTION ON JUN-05-2017 IN DEPT. 206. DEFENDANTS KWOK SZETO AND WEST COM 1520 LLC'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. JOEL DAVID BIERER APPEARING FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT WEST COM 1520, LLC AND DEFENDANT KWOK HUNG SZETO. TED KIM, COURT CERTIFIED KOREAN INTERPRETER, WITH OATH ON FILE, IS PRESENT IN COURT. NO APPEARANCE FOR PLAINTIFF. NO OTHER APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ORDERED THE CASE DISMISSED AS TO THE COMPLAINT ONLY. MR. BIERER REPRESENTED TO THE COURT THAT PAPERS WERE SERVED AT MR. CHUNG'S ADDRESS OF GOLDEN GATE, BUT HE WAS NOT THERE AT THAT TIME ACCORDING TO THE WIFE OF MR. CHUNG. MR. BIERER HANDED THE PAPERS TO THE WIFE AND MR. BIERER ALSO CALLED MR. CHUNG EVERY DAY AND THERE WAS NO CALL BACK FROM MR. CHUNG. THE COURT ORDERED THE MATTER FOR A DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING AS TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS-COMPLAINANT WEST COM 1520 LLC. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF JUN-05-2017 ASSIGNED TO COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON JUN-19-2017 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 514, JUDGE STEPHEN M. MURPHY FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING AS TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS-COMPLAINANT WEST COM 1520 LLC. JOEL DAVID BIERER APPEARING FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT WEST COM 1520, LLC AND DEFENDANT KWOK HUNG SZETO. TED KIM, COURT CERTIFIED KOREAN INTERPRETER, WITH OATH ON FILE, IS PRESENT IN COURT. NO APPEARANCE FOR PLAINTIFF. NO OTHER APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ORDERED THE CASE DISMISSED AS TO THE COMPLAINT ONLY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) [***CASE IS DISMISSED AS TO THE COMPLAINT.***] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.