Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Engage Hospitality Llc,, Kph Management Llc,, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Silverstein, Amy L, against Cisneros, Jose, City And County Of San Francisco, Does 1 Through 50, represented by Ammons, David W., Lakritz, Thomas S, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions230 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
|
Case Cycle Time470 days |
This complaint is a request for judicial notice in support of the plaintiffs' opposition to the defendants' demurrer to the plaintiffs' first amended complaint for refund of 2014 San Francisco hotel tax penalties. The plaintiffs are KPH Management LL...
ORDER ORDER
Date: April 27, 2017ORDER ON DEMURRER
Date: September 26, 2016NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 09, 2016ORDER ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: May 16, 2017ORDER ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION REQUESTING RELIEF FROM WAIVER
Date: April 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2017 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | PARTIES/ATTORNEYS FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE # CGC-16-550351 ADDED TO LEAD CASE # CGC-16-554309 FOR MAILING OF COURT NOTICES. | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-05-2017 VACATED. ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE # CGC-16-550351 WITH LEAD CASE # CGC-16-554309 FOR ALL PURPOSES FILED 05/23/17. (206) | |
May 23, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS Matter on calendar for Tuesday, May 23, 2017, Line 3, PLAINTIFF KPH MANAGEMENT LLC,, ENGAGE HOSPITALITY LLC, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-16-550354, CGC-1...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-16-550351, CGC-16-550354, CGC-16-554304 WITH CASE CGC-16-554309, ORDER; ALL FURTHER ENTRIES UNDER CASE CGC-16-554309 | |
May 23, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-16-550354, CGC-16-554304, CGC-16-554309 WITH CASE CGC-16-550351
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-23-2017 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFFS KPH MANAGEMENT LLC, AND ENGAGE HOSPITALITY LLC'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-16-550354, CGC-16-554304, CGC-16-554309 WITH CASE CGC-16-550351 - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS CASE WITH THREE OTHER CASES (CASE NUMBERS 554304, 554309 AND 550354) IS GRANTED. ALL FOUR CASES ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES AND THE LEAD CASE IS 554309. ALL FURTHER FILINGS MUST BE IN THE LEAD CASE ONLY. DEFENDANTS DO NOT OPPOSE CONSOLIDATION OF ALL FOUR CASES. PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO VACATE ALL TRIAL DATES AND TO SET A NEW TRIAL DATE WITH ALL DISCOVERY DEADLINES TO BE TRIGGERED OFF THE NEW TRIAL DATE IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO MAKING THAT REQUEST BY MOTION TO BE HEARD IN DEPARTMENT 206. TRIAL DATE IS DECEMBER 11, 2017. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER: CAROL KAREN, CSR # 8189 =(302/HK) | |
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100015843) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KPH MANAGEMENT LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ENGAGE HOSPITALITY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.