Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Competente, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Chin, Robert Vee, against Chan, Yuk-Sing, Deng, Sarah J., Does 1-30, Inclusive, represented by Wang, Nathan N., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions523 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time557 days |
This complaint is a personal injury action filed by David Competente against Yuk-Sing Chan, Sarah J. Deng, and Does 1-30. The complaint alleges that on March 3, 2014, Competente was rear-ended by Chan while stopped at a red light on the southbound 28...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2017 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-15-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 10, 2017 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100017978) EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES. | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-07-2017 HELD AND SETTLED. CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON AUG-15-2017 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (4.5) | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-10-2017 - CASE SETTLED AT JUN-07-2017 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. | |
June 07, 2017 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SETTLEMENT ATTORNEY 1 |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 100016607) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHAN, YUK-SING DENG, SARAH J. | |
May 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Compelling Responses To Supplemental Interrogatory And Supplemental Demand For Inspection And For Monetary Sanctions
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY 302, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IS OFF CALENDAR, PER THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.