Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Farm Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Subrogation - Insurance case represented by Mahfouz, Richard L., against Does 1 To 40, Inclusive, Reyes, Fanny, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategorySubrogation/Insurance |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions155 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeSubrogation |
|
Case Cycle Time172 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2016 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-06-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59095058) | |
May 04, 2016 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT UNCONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58886051) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-04-2016 CONTINUED TO JUL-06-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58814778) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100013153), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED JAN-28-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT REYES, FANNY | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBROGATION/INSURANCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT REYES, FANNY DOES 1 TO 40, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-04-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-29-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-11-2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.