Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Calvary Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Jin, Xiaomei, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 04, 2015 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions229 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time229 days |
This complaint was filed by Brian N. Winn, an attorney from the Winn Law Group, on behalf of the plaintiff, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. The defendant in this case is Xiaomei Jin, et al. The complaint was filed in the Superior Court of San Francisco County. T...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2016 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59167077) | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-21-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-21-2016 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58239775) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVARY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PROPER VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 58128997) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVARY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALVARY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT JIN, XIAOMEI DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-02-2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.