Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GUSTAVO A MEJIA VS. DAMODAR CHANDRADAS ET AL
On October 13, 2015 a personal injury/property damage - vehicle related case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 13, 2015
Last Refreshed
November 23, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
John K. Stewart;Category
PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years, 9 months and 6 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
Number of causes of action 35 i ence = Atom fies Rmotonal t Distress lon v. Legg Thiscase (jis Dat lass action suit. . If there are any known related cases, file and serve a notice of related case. (You may use form CM-015,
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by Gustavo A. Mejia against Damodar Chandradas, Amara Irizarry, and other unnamed defendants. The complaint alleges negligence and emotional distress as a result of a car accident that occurred on October …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2018 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-31-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100042868) | |
May 08, 2018 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-08-2018 CONTINUED TO JUL-31-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF KHALDOUN A. BAGHDADI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100036443) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
January 30, 2018 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-30-2018 CONTINUED TO MAY-08-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF KHALDOUN A. BAGHDADI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100030361) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
October 31, 2017 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-31-2017 CONTINUED TO JAN-30-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF KHALDOUN A. BAGHDADI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 61280019) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
August 08, 2017 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-08-2017 CONTINUED TO OCT-31-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. MCDEVITT IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 60924244) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
June 13, 2017 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-13-2017 CONTINUED TO AUG-08-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF KHALDOUN A. BAGHDADI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 60693687) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
March 14, 2017 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-14-2017 CONTINUED TO JUN-13-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. MCDEVITT IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 60316942) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
December 13, 2016 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-13-2016 CONTINUED TO MAR-14-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF KHALDOUN A. BAGHDADI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 59920074) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
September 13, 2016 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-13-2016 CONTINUED TO DEC-13-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF KHALDOUN A. BAGHDADI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 59520603) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
June 07, 2016 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR SEP-13-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUN-07-2016 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT , CONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 59012825) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF KHALDOUN A. BAGHDADI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59009133) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
April 27, 2016 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-07-2016 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE APR-27-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 16, 2016 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-16-2016 CONTINUED TO APR-27-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event | JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 15288061) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEJIA, GUSTAVO A AS TO DEFENDANT CHANDRADAS, DAMODAR IRIZARRY, AMARA DOES 1 TO 60, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-16-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-14-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-22-2016 |