Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Benson, Susan M, against Does 1 To V, Inclusive, Hertz Vehicles, Llc, represented by Colman, Jonathan H, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions148 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time291 days |
This complaint is a proof of service document filed by Susan M. Benson, an attorney representing State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The defendant in this case is Hertz Vehicles, LLC. The document states that copies of the summons and com...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 03, 2015ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15280037) FILED BY DEFENDANT HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC
Date: October 08, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT TO ARBITRATION OF FEB-01-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ARBITRATOR CHARLES OWEN GEERHART APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION FEB-01-2016 THROUGH MAY-01-2016. | |
February 01, 2016 | Hearing |
ARBITRATOR JURISDICTION CALENDAR LIST
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
February 01, 2016 | Hearing |
ASSIGN TO ARBITRATION CALENDAR LIST
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100013044) | |
January 06, 2016 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15355009) FILED BY DEFENDANT HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR FEB-01-2016. THE JAN-06-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100010513) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15280037) FILED BY DEFENDANT HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.