Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hershberger, Ashley, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hooshmand, Mark, against Does 1 Through 20, Hershberger, Ashley, Ngai, Jennifer, Ngai, Woon Keung, represented by Colombatto, Paul Richard, Hooshmand, Mark, Peterson, Robert Howard, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 14, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time343 days |
This complaint is an answer filed by Ashley Hershberger in response to a complaint filed by Jennifer Ngai. Ashley Hershberger denies all allegations made by Jennifer Ngai. Ashley Hershberger also presents several affirmative defenses, including the d...
SEPARATE STATEMENT RE MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 57912705) FILED BY DEFENDANT NGAI, JENNIFER
Date: September 24, 2015REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57912705) FILED BY DEFENDANT NGAI, JENNIFER
Date: September 24, 2015ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58008273) FILED BY DEFENDANT NGAI, WOON KEUNG
Date: October 13, 2015ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-15-548206 WITH CASE CGC-15-547392, ORDER
Date: December 03, 2015ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58106655) FILED BY DEFENDANT NGAI, JENNIFER
Date: November 03, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58062362) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERSHBERGER, ASHLEY
Date: October 23, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57951130) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HERSHBERGER, ASHLEY
Date: October 01, 2015ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF ASHLEY HERSHBERGER TO ADVANCE DEMURRER HEARING
Date: September 30, 2015NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2016 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-25-2016 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 7/21/16. (206) | |
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59310643) | |
February 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Complaint
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
February 24, 2016 | Hearing |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 58442716): COLOMBATTO, PAUL RICHARD SUBSTITUTED FOR PETERSON, ROBERT HOWARD AS ATTORNEY FOR NGAI, JENNIFER | |
January 13, 2016 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-25-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-13-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | PARTIES/ATTORNEYS FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE CGC-15-548206 ADDED TO LEAD CASE CGC-15-547392 FOR MAILING OF COURT NOTICES. | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF JENNIFER NGAI (CGC-15-548206) (TRANSACTION ID # 58281664) FILED BY DEFENDANT HERSHBERGER, ASHLEY (CGC-15-548206) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.