Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mozafari, Maryam, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Pocklington, Daniel T., against City And County Of San Francisco,, City Of San Francisco, County Of San Francisco, Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, represented by Rosenstein, Diana, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 16, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Non-Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions764 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Case Cycle Time776 days |
ORDER GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: December 16, 2016NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60095088) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOZAFARI, MARYAM
Date: January 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2017 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-15-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60874235) | |
April 10, 2017 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
March 07, 2017 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-07-2017 CONTINUED TO AUG-15-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60095088) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOZAFARI, MARYAM | |
January 09, 2017 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-03-2017 HELD AND SETTLED. CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON MAR-07-2017 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (5.0) | |
January 03, 2017 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SETTLEMENT ATTORNEY 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.