Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hua, Qing Mei, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Enyinwa, Emmanuel, against Does 1 To 20, Wong Family Revocable Trust, represented by Maltz, Robert Mark, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 01, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time417 days |
This complaint is a response from the defendants, WONG FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST, to the plaintiffs' complaint. The defendants deny all the allegations made by the plaintiffs and deny that the plaintiffs have sustained any damages. The defendants also r...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57928981) FILED BY DEFENDANT WONG FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST
Date: September 28, 2015NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 01, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2016 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-05-2016 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 5/20/16. (206) | |
June 15, 2016 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SETTLEMENT ATTORNEY 2 |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-15-2016 - NOT HELD AND REMOVED. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (0.5) | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUN-15-2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER MARK PETERSEN. | |
November 25, 2015 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-05-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOV-25-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58131433) FILED BY DEFENDANT WONG FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS | |
September 30, 2015 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.