Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Song, You Liang, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Pro Per, against Does 1 To 10, Sum, Wai Sun, represented by Lindstrom, Peter A., Sakai, Masumi M., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 26, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions62 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Case Cycle Time134 days |
RESPONSE TO DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, YOU LIANG
Date: May 19, 2015NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 26, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, YOU LIANG
Date: August 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2015 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-26-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, YOU LIANG | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 100001678) FILED BY DEFENDANT SUM, WAI SUN | |
May 27, 2015 | Tentative Ruling |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, May 27, 2015, line 4. DEFENDANT WAI SUM'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND to allege a cause...
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
May 27, 2015 | Hearing |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, COURT ADOPTS THE TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT WAI SUM'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGE RONALD EVANS QUIDACHAY, CLERK:N. WONG, NOT REPORTED, D501. | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, DEFENDANT WAI SUM'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND TO ALLEGE A CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST THE DEFENDANT. PLAINTIFF SHOULD ALSO INDICATE WHY VENUE IS PROPER IN THIS COUNTY BASED ON WHATEVER CAUSES OF ACTION PLAINTIFF ALLEGES. PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE A FORM OF ORDER THAT CONFORMS TO THE TENTATIVE APPROVED AS TO FORM OR IN COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.1312.JUDGE RONALD EVANS QUIDACHAY, CLERK:N. WONG, NOT REPORTED, D501. | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-27-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.