Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hrd Coffee Shop Inc., Yeung, David, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gumbiner, Joel Philip, against Banks, Joanna, Bingowah, Llc, Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Tom, Richard, represented by Chan, Darius T., Scheley, Paul Christian, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 02, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions287 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time583 days |
This complaint is an amended proof of service document in a legal case filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case is HRD Coffee Shop Inc. and David Yeung v. Richard Tom, Joanna Banks, Bingowah LLC, and Does 1 through...
ORDER AFTER HEARING GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF RICHARD TOM AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 30, 2015NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 02, 2015ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: August 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2016 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59652694) | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-11-2016 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 10/05/16. (206) | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59354301) AS TO DEFENDANT BANKS, JOANNA BINGOWAH, LLC | |
April 06, 2016 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-11-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-06-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58677148) AS TO DEFENDANT TOM, RICHARD | |
February 03, 2016 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58450570) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANKS, JOANNA BINGOWAH, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANT RICHARD TOM'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.