Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Oomba, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Graft, Alex, Nassi, Shahram, Winghart, Andrew D., against Does 1 To 10, Tucker, Amy, represented by Goffin, Glenn M, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ernest H. Goldsmith presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions125 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time469 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15357023)
Date: December 24, 2015REMITTITUR DISMISSED A146851 DIV 2
Date: June 07, 2016ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: September 04, 2015CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: February 23, 2016CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: December 03, 2015CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 0)
Date: January 19, 2016CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: November 06, 2015NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT (MELANIE GHENO)
Date: November 09, 2015ORDER AWARDING DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CAL. CIV. CODE SEC. 3426.4
Date: October 20, 2015PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15250021) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUCKER, AMY AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: September 08, 2015PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15243076) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUCKER, AMY AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: September 01, 2015NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED A146851 DIV 2 | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 59054586) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUCKER, AMY AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO PLAINTIFF OOMBA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO DEFENDANT TUCKER, AMY AN INDIVIDUAL | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 16084031) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUCKER, AMY AN INDIVIDUAL | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16084031) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUCKER, AMY AN INDIVIDUAL | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AMY TUCKER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT DEFENDANT TUCKER, AMY AN INDIVIDUAL RECOVER FROM PLAINTIFF OOMBA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION $50,000.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $9,675.00 (SANCTIONS), TOTAL JUDGMENT $59,675.00, (AMENDED JUDGMENT) | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF GLENN M. GOFFIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMY TUCKERS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16082033) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUCKER, AMY AN INDIVIDUAL | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16082033) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUCKER, AMY AN INDIVIDUAL | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMY TUCKERS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16082033) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUCKER, AMY AN INDIVIDUAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.