Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vinocur, Laurence, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Moscone, Christopher C., against Does 1-100 Inclusive, Epic Products , Inc, Gelson'S Markets, represented by Miller, Jesse L, Shanberg, Ross E., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeri L. Jackson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time872 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case. The plaintiff, Laurence Vinocur, is suing the defendant, Epic Products, Inc., and others. The document states that the plaintiff served copies of the summons, complaint, civil ...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56783599) FILED BY DEFENDANT GELSON'S MARKETS
Date: February 17, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100018140) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VINOCUR, LAURENCE
Date: April 21, 2016NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 09, 2015ORDER AND STIPULATION REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: May 04, 2015ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT
Date: June 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2017 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-06-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO TERMS OF PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021717) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VINOCUR, LAURENCE | |
June 08, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And [Proposed] Consent Judgment SET FOR HEARING ON WEDNESDAY, JUNE 8, 2016, LINE 4 PLAINTIFF LAURENCE VINOCUR'S Motion To Approve Propo...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
June 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And [Proposed] Consent Judgment
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: PURSUANT TO TERMS OF PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT) | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-08-2016 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF LAURENCE VINOCUR'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND [PROPOSED] CONSENT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. ORDER AND A SEPARATE JUDGMENT SIGNED. JUDGE: SUZANNE BOLANOS. CLERK: ROSIE NOGUERA. NOT REPORTED. | |
May 09, 2016 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.