Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fu, Bryant, Lei, Crystal, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Avila, Jr., Niceforo Luceno, Johnson, Michael Kenneth, Lapham, Mark, Pro Per, Rouse, Cheryl Christine, (total of 6) See All against 547 Investments, Llc, 547 Investments Llc A California Limited Liability, Anew Law Corporation A California Corporation, Does 1 To 50, Epona Investment Group Llc A California Limited, (total of 10) See All represented by Avila, Jr., Niceforo Luceno, Disston, William Leeds, Lapham, Mark, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Murlene J. Randle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2014 |
CategoryFraud |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1930 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
This complaint is a response from Defendant Demas Yan to Plaintiff's complaint. The Defendant denies all the allegations made in the Plaintiff's complaint. The Defendant also presents several affirmative defenses, including the statute of limitations...
ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL A158641 DIV 3
Date: January 08, 2020ORDER FROM COA [SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT] A158641 DIV 3
Date: January 17, 2020ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO TAX AND STRIKE COSTS
Date: November 06, 2019ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT DEMAS YAN'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: October 28, 2019STATEMENT OF DECISION AND JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2019REMITTITUR PARTIAL A158641 DIV 3
Date: March 11, 2020TENTATIVE DECISION
Date: July 31, 2019CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: May 13, 2022CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: July 20, 2022ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE (A165254 DIV 3)
Date: May 31, 2022CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 09, 2022MINUTES FOR APR-21-2022 9:30 AM
Date: April 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 210008678) FILED BY APPELLANT YAN, TINA
Date: June 06, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 210002057) FILED BY APPELLANT YAN, TINA
Date: March 04, 2022ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: February 03, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: March 14, 2022NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL - [APPEAL FILED 3-4-22] SENT TO APPELLANT YAN, TINA
Date: March 21, 2022CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL - [APPEAL FILED 3-4-22]
Date: March 21, 2022NOTICE TO ATTEND TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEI, CRYSTAL AN INDIVIDUAL FU, BRYANT AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: September 17, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210002962)
Date: March 15, 2022CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: October 29, 2019CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: December 11, 2019CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL [APPEAL FILED 9-27-19]
Date: November 01, 2019REMITTITUR FILED A158641 DIV 3 [SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS]
Date: June 08, 2021STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: December 01, 2021CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 8-19-19)
Date: October 15, 2019MINUTES FOR OCT-04-2021 9:30 AM
Date: October 04, 2021ORDER AWARDING COSTS TO PLAINTIFFS
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2021EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: December 01, 2021MINUTES FOR JAN-28-2022 1:30 PM
Date: January 28, 2022ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: December 01, 2021ORDER : MINUTE ORDER RE: TRIAL EVIDENCE
Date: November 15, 2021WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: July 09, 2019EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: July 09, 2019MINUTES FOR AUG-30-2019 9:30 AM
Date: August 30, 2019EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: July 09, 2019MINUTES FOR JUL-03-2019 9:00 AM
Date: July 03, 2019WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 63496426) FILED BY DEFENDANT YAN, DEMAS
Date: July 01, 2019MINUTES FOR JUL-01-2019 9:50 AM
Date: July 01, 2019MINUTES FOR JUL-02-2019 9:00 AM
Date: July 02, 2019TRIAL TESTIMONY (TRANSACTION ID # 63505753) FILED BY DEFENDANT YAN, DEMAS
Date: July 02, 2019ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: June 24, 2019NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 26, 2014ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT
Date: May 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR KAPLAN, GARY M. AS ATTORNEY FOR LEI, CRYSTAL AN INDIVIDUAL | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR KAPLAN, GARY M. AS ATTORNEY FOR FU, BRYANT AN INDIVIDUAL | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 8.124, NO RT [APPEAL FILED 6-6-22, A165373 DIV 3] | |
July 12, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED
Judge: MURLENE J. RANDLE |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL CLERK'S AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 6/6/22) | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION AT-138/EJ-125 (TRANSACTION ID # 210009132) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEI, CRYSTAL AN INDIVIDUAL FU, BRYANT AN INDIVIDUAL | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (8.124)(NO RT)(TRANSACTION ID # 210008817) FILED BY APPELLANT YAN, TINA | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 210008678) FILED BY APPELLANT YAN, TINA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.