Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos, Ryan E., against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Palacios, Edgardo A., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 18, 2014 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions170 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1105 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE
Date: December 05, 2014NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 15036079) FILED BY ATTORNEY VOS, RYAN E.
Date: February 06, 2015DECLARATION RE: INTEREST AND WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: December 05, 2014DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH LLC
Date: December 05, 2014DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH LLC
Date: December 05, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,665.24 INTEREST, $115.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100028256) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH LLC | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN MATEO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT PALACIOS, EDGARDO A. | |
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT PALACIOS, EDGARDO A. | |
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN MATEO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT PALACIOS, EDGARDO A. | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $277.58 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15130060) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH LLC | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $220.93 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15097060) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH LLC | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT PALACIOS, EDGARDO A. | |
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $183.17 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15077024) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH LLC | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 15036079) FILED BY ATTORNEY VOS, RYAN E. | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.