Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sysco San Francisco, Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cook, David Julian, against Asli, Amir, Does I To X, And Each Of Them Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Charles S. Crompton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles S. Crompton Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 07, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions72 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time336 days |
This complaint was filed by SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC., a California corporation, against AMIR ASLI and others. The case number is CGC-14-539149 and the filing date is May 16, 2014. The complaint was served to AMIR ASLI individually and doing business...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2015 | Hearing |
ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED
Judge: CHARLES CROMPTON |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT AMIR ASLI, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BACHEESO AND DBA BACHEESO GARDEN, ET AL., ON APR-08-2015 OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY JUDGMENT DEBTOR. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (514) | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT ASLI, AMIR INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BACHEESO AND DBA BACHEESO GARDEN BISTRO | |
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT AMIR ASLI, BACHEESO AND DBA BACHEESO GARDEN BISTRO. MAR-05-2015, NO APPEARANCE BY OR BEHALF OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR. RYAN L. DAHM, ESQ., APPEARING FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR. CONTINUED TO APR-08-2015 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 FOR LETTER. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (514) | |
March 05, 2015 | Hearing |
ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED
Judge: CHARLES CROMPTON |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15060085) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT ASLI, AMIR INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA BACHEESO AND DBA BACHEESO GARDEN BISTRO OEX HEARING SET FOR MAR-05-2015 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514 | |
September 10, 2014 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-10-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.