Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
New, Joseph S, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Foondos, Stephen J, against Bank Of America, N.A., Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Recontrust Company, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association As Trustee For The, (total of 5) See All represented by Marienthal, Aaron R., Sullivan, Mary Kate, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions186 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Case Cycle Time404 days |
This complaint is a reply in support of defendants' demurrer to the plaintiff's second amended complaint. The plaintiff, Joseph S. New, claims wrongful foreclosure, arguing that the loan was not transferred to a securitized trust prior to its closing...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 18, 2014REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
Date: August 19, 2014ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL
Date: October 21, 2014DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Date: November 25, 2014ORDER ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)
Date: November 10, 2014ORDER ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 03, 2015REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15139111)
Date: May 20, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57290991)
Date: May 26, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2015 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-16-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 57290991) | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF NEW, JOSEPH S TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF HARBORVIEW 2005-2 TRUST FUND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15139111) FILED BY DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF HARBORVIEW 2005-2 TRUST FUND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JOEL C. SPANN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15139111) FILED BY DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF HARBORVIEW 2005-2 TRUST FUND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15139111) FILED BY DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF HARBORVIEW 2005-2 TRUST FUND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15139111) | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15139111) FILED BY DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF HARBORVIEW 2005-2 TRUST FUND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15139111) FILED BY DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF HARBORVIEW 2005-2 TRUST FUND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.