Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Borruso, Angelita, Borruso, Julio, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Gonzalez, Christopher J., Timken, Heidi A, Yandell, Keith D, against Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Ndex West, Llc, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Successor By Merger, represented by Bailey, Robert A, Rapkine, Michael, Treder, Edward A., Yandell, Keith D, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions94 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time595 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case. The case number is CGC-14-537153 and it was filed by Wesley G. Ramirez on Mar-25-2014. The plaintiffs are Julio Borruso and Angelita Borruso, and the defendants are Wells ...
ORDER AND JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: February 25, 2014POS OF OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF BORRUSO, JULIO BORRUSO, ANGELITA
Date: February 07, 2014RECORD REMANDED BACK TO SUPERIOR COURT
Date: February 06, 2014NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 04, 2014ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: December 31, 2014CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: August 07, 2014CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL
Date: September 04, 2014NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 56496110) FILED BY ATTORNEY TIMKEN, HEIDI A
Date: December 18, 2014CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: October 21, 2014ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Date: June 17, 2014NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL FILED BY CROSS-APPELLANT BORRUSO, JULIO BORRUSO, ANGELITA
Date: August 26, 2014REMITTITUR DISMISSED A142688 DIV 1
Date: July 02, 2015REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF WELLS FARGO'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT.
Date: March 25, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2015 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $2,416.45 RE 32562 FOR TRANSACTION W1614423D008 (OTHER TRUST DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO TIMKEN JOHNSON LLP CLIENT TRUST, DOC#1907076868, WARRANT #38203998, DATED SEP-22-2015 | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $2,416.45 RE 32644 FOR TRANSACTION W2214527D005 (OTHER TRUST DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO TIMKEN JOHNSON LLP CLIENT TRUST, DOC#1907076869, WARRANT #38203998, DATED SEP-22-2015 | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-19-2015 VACATED. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206) | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57840879) | |
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER EX PARTE APPLICATION RE STIPULATION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT WITH COURT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS) | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J. GONZALEZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO OBTAIN ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT WITH COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 57763745) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BORRUSO, JULIO BORRUSO, ANGELITA | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT WITH COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 57763745) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BORRUSO, JULIO BORRUSO, ANGELITA | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED A142688 DIV 1 | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT WITH COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 57470917) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BORRUSO, JULIO BORRUSO, ANGELITA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.