Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Farrel, Edward, Farrel, Molly, Kinzi, Rosa, Kinzl, Johann, Guardado, Manuel Gomez, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Smith, Willliam B, against At&T Corp., Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Guardado, Manuel Gomez, Open Top Sightseeing San Francisco, Llc, Pacific Bell Telephone Company Dba At&T California, (total of 5) See All represented by Donnellan, Gerard J, Laforce, Norman Charles, Mouroux, Gregory B., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions193 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time771 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case is between Rosa Zinzi and Open Top Sightseeing San Francisco, LLC. The request for dismissal is filed by Norman La Force, who is the attorney for Open Top Sightseeing. The form indic...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT AT&T CORP.
Date: April 11, 2014ORDER ALLOWING FIRST AMENDMENT TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION AND CONTRIBUTION
Date: November 13, 2014AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE ELEVEN TO BE AT&T CORP.
Date: February 27, 2014ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO INTERVENE
Date: July 21, 2014NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 30, 2013NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-22-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.
Date: November 20, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2015 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-16-2015 VACATED. DISMISSALS ON FILE. (206) | |
August 17, 2015 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
June 22, 2015 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION ALL PARTIES TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS, EXPENSES, AND ATTORNEYS FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 15160129) | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY OPEN TOP SIGHTSEEING SAN FRANCISCO, LLC, GUARDADO, MANUEL GOMEZ ALSO AS TO PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY ON MARCH 24, 2014. EACH SIDE TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS & FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100000381) | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15153070) FILED BY INTERVENOR EUROPAISCHE REISEVERSICHERUNG AG | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15116053) AS TO DEFENDANT AT&T CORP. PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY DBA AT&T CALIFORNIA | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 15116053): DONNELLAN, GERARD J SUBSTITUTED FOR MOUROUX, GREGORY B. AS ATTORNEY FOR PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY DBA AT&T CALIFORNIA PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY DBA AT&T CALIFORNIA PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY DBA AT&T CALIFORNIA | |
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE - UNCONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15077083) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KINZI, ROSA KINZL, JOHANN FARREL, MOLLY FARREL, EDWARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.