Related Content
in San Francisco County
Ruling
ESTEBAN SAMORA SERRANO VS. ANTOLINI LUIGI&C. S.P.A. ET AL
Jul 22, 2024 |
CGC24614333
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Monday, July 22, 2024, Line 9. 2 - DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION's MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT. Granted in part. (The Court's complete tentative ruling has been emailed to the parties.) For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. =(302/CK)
Ruling
1000 CHANNEL STREET (SF) OWNER, LLC VS. LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION INC. ET AL
Jul 25, 2024 |
CGC23611093
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Thursday, July 25, 2024, Line 12. 1 - DEFENDANT APOGEE WAUSAU GROUP, INC.'s MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. Devon Holstadt's unopposed pro hac vice application is granted. For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. =(302/RBU)
Ruling
LISA STRAUCH EGGERS ET AL VS. DEXTERITY, INC. ET AL
Jul 25, 2024 |
CGC22600042
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Thursday, July 25, 2024, Line 1. DEFENDANT DEXTERITY, INC., ROGER HAU AND SAMIR MENON's MOTION TO STRIKE 2ND Amended COMPLAINT Off calendar. Leave to file third amended complaint granted on July 24, 2024. =(302/RBU)
Ruling
RICHARD WIST, AN INDIVIDUAL ET AL VS. FORDE MAZZOLA ASSOC., INC. ET AL
Jul 26, 2024 |
CGC23604358
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Friday, July 26, 2024, Line 4. DEFENDANT FORDE MAZZOLA ASSOCIATES, INC.'s MOTION TO BIFURCATE/SEVER Trial. The motion to bifurcate is TRANSFERRED to Department 206 on the day of trial (8/26/24) to be heard by the assigned trial judge. =(302/RCE)
Ruling
ANNA OSTROVSKY VS. LEGALMATCH.COM, ET AL
Jul 23, 2024 |
CGC23606626
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Tuesday, July 23, 2024, Line 9. DEFENDANT DMITRY SHUBOV AN INDIVIDUAL AND VLADIMIR SHUBOV's MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST Amended COMPLAINT. Continued to August 7, 2024, to be heard by Judge Ulmer. =(302/CK)
Ruling
WINNY BAMBICO ET AL VS. SONIC.NET, LLC ET AL
Jul 24, 2024 |
CGC22602897
Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Wednesday, Jul-24-2024, Line 1, 2-PLAINTIFFS WINNY BAMBICO, and JAMESON BAMBICO's Motion To Compel Defendant Sonic.Net, Llc. To Provide Verifications To Request For Admissions, Set One; And Request For Sanctions. Continued to August 21, 2024 on the court's motion. (D302)
Ruling
JOHN DOE VS. SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL
Jul 26, 2024 |
CGC23607879
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Friday, July 26, 2024, Line 6. CLARIFICATION HEARING RE: ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR STAY. Hearing required and counsel are ordered to appear. Friday's Law & Motion Calendar will be called out of Dept. 301. Anyone intending to appear in person should report to Dept. 301. However, anyone intending to appear remotely should use the regular Zoom information for Dept. 302's Law & Motion Calendar for 9:30 a.m. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. =(302/RCE)
Ruling
CHINA LIVE VENTURES LIMITED, L.P. VS. 644 BROADWAY LLC ET AL
Jul 24, 2024 |
CGC21590574
Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for July 24, 2024 line 1. OTHER GREGG WILLIAMS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE is GRANTED. Receiver to file a complaint/cross-complaint in intervention forthwith. =(501/CFH) Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849; or Phone Dial in: (669) 254-5252; Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.
Ruling
ANN WEST VS. MANOUSO MANOS ET AL
Jul 26, 2024 |
CGC23611164
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Friday, July 26, 2024, Line 12. 1 - DEFENDANT B.K.S. IYENGAR YOGA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION US' DEMURRER to Amended COMPLAINT. Defendant B.K.S. Iyengar Yoga National Association US's (IYNAUS) demurrer to the First Amended Complaint (FAC) is sustained in part with leave to amend and overruled in part. (The Court's complete tentative ruling has been emailed to the parties.) Friday's Law & Motion Calendar will be called out of Dept. 301. Anyone intending to appear in person should report to Dept. 301. However, anyone intending to appear remotely should use the regular Zoom information for Dept. 302's Law & Motion Calendar for 9:30 a.m. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the defendant is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. =(302/RCE)
Document
JESSE COLON VS. NICKOLAS JESSUP ET AL
Jul 23, 2024 |
Anne-Christine Massullo |
PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED |
PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED |
CGC24616685