Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rogers, Paul, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kasreliovich, Slav, against Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Roth, Dora, Roth, Frederic, The Roth Family Trust, represented by Plas, Steven James, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 11, 2013 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Non-Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Case Cycle Time460 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint document in a legal case. The case number is CGC-13-532777 and it was filed on Jul-22-2013. The plaintiff is Paul Rogers and the defendant is Frederic Roth. The document states that the pa...
TRIAL DE NOVO FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGERS, PAUL
Date: May 29, 2014EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: August 10, 2015WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: August 10, 2015MINUTES FOR OCT-14-2014 8:45 AM
Date: October 14, 2014JURY INSTRUCTIONS JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN--SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: October 14, 2014NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGERS, PAUL
Date: August 01, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-08-2014 8:45 AM
Date: October 08, 2014NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 11, 2013EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: August 10, 2015MINUTES FOR OCT-10-2014 8:45 AM
Date: October 10, 2014ORDER TO RETURN EXHIBITS AND/OR DEPOSITIONS
Date: October 16, 2014MINUTES FOR OCT-07-2014 10:14 AM
Date: October 07, 2014MINUTES FOR OCT-08-2014 8:45 AM
Date: October 09, 2014JURY VERDICT
Date: October 14, 2014PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE FEB-20-2014.
Date: February 10, 2014DEFENDANT(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR JOHN JOSEPH MURRAY.
Date: February 20, 2014ARBITRATOR JOHN LEON BOOS APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION FEB-21-2014 THROUGH MAY-22-2014.
Date: February 21, 2014DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT ROTH, FREDERIC AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: August 29, 2013PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR JOHN JOSEPH MURRAY.
Date: February 19, 2014AWARD FILED BY ARBITRATOR
Date: May 20, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FILED | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $6,782.23 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE MAR-20-2015,, (TRANSACTION ID # 56830000) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROTH, DORA AN INDIVIDUAL THE ROTH FAMILY TRUST A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $6,782.23 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE FEB-19-2015,, (TRANSACTION ID # 56681620) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROTH, DORA AN INDIVIDUAL THE ROTH FAMILY TRUST A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $14,246.04 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JAN-28-2015,, (TRANSACTION ID # 56641631) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROTH, DORA AN INDIVIDUAL THE ROTH FAMILY TRUST A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ON VERDICT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT DEFENDANT THE ROTH FAMILY TRUST A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN RECOVER FROM PLAINTIFF ROGERS, PAUL SEE SCANNED DOC. FOR DETAILS. | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGERS, PAUL FEE DEPOSITED BY C Z & R FOR JURY FEE FOR OCT-09-2014 THROUGH OCT-14-2014 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 306 | |
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RETURN EXHIBITS AND/OR DEPOSITIONS | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR OCT-14-2014 8:45 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.