Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dagel, Richard, Michaelson, Christopher, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bostwick, James Stephen, against Cohen Md, David, Does 1 To 50 Inclusive, Engelmann Md, Guy, Englemann Md, Guy, Falltrick Md, Robert, (total of 7) See All represented by Depolo, David Alan, Dood, John H., Gharrity, Joseph Christophe, Goldman, Ronald Paul, Marsh, Barry Clement, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time888 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case number is CGC-13-532718 and it was filed on February 13, 2014. The plaintiff/petitioner is Richard Dagel, et al. and the defendant/respondent is Kenneth Light, M.D., et al. The reque...
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GUY ENGELMANN, M.D. (TRANSACTION ID # 14345451)
Date: December 12, 2014ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE
Date: October 01, 2014ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DAVID COHEN, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2014OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT COHEN MD, DAVID
Date: December 10, 2013OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED BY DEFENDANT COHEN MD, DAVID
Date: December 10, 2013DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO PLAINTIFF MICHAELSON, CHRISTOPHER
Date: February 13, 2014NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT LIGHT MD, KENNETH
Date: December 09, 2013ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT ROBERT FALLTRACK, MD.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT COHEN MD, DAVID
Date: March 10, 2014NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR NOV-10-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.
Date: December 11, 2013OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED BY DEFENDANT ENGLEMANN MD, GUY
Date: December 23, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAINT FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Date: August 05, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LIGHT MD, KENNETH
Date: August 23, 2013DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION (LOSS OF CONSORTIUM) ONLY
Date: September 24, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FALLTRICK MD, ROBERT
Date: August 19, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT COHEN MD, DAVID
Date: July 24, 2013NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 09, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ENGLEMANN MD, GUY
Date: August 29, 2013CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT FALLTRICK MD, ROBERT JURY DEMANDED
Date: November 18, 2013ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION
Date: July 28, 2015ORDER RE: DEFENDANT LIGHT'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF DRS. POTTORFF AND SWISHER
Date: October 06, 2014ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ROBERT FALLTRICK, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 20, 2015ORDER CONTINUING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATES
Date: April 17, 2015ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE
Date: May 21, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2016 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-19-2016 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 8/24/15. (206) | |
September 10, 2015 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT And Notice Of Motion For Summary Judgement Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication By Defendant Kenneth Light, M.D. On calendar for Thursday, September 10, 2015, Line 2...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
September 10, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT And Notice Of Motion For Summary Judgement Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication By Defendant Kenneth Light, M.D.
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
September 10, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-10-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT SAINT FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION FILED ON AUGUST 24, 2015. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: SEAN KANE, NOT REPORTED. (302/EHG) | |
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT KENNETH LIGHT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION FILED ON AUGUST 24, 2015. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: SEAN KANE, NOT REPORTED. (302/EHG) | |
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100004446) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAINT FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL | |
August 27, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.