Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SEMEYON GOFMAN VS. WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, et al
On June 27, 2013 an other non exempt complaints case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 27, 2013
Last Refreshed
November 23, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Case Duration
1 year, 9 months and 30 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
(5)_] Entire action of all parties and all causes of action 6
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a request for dismissal in case number CGC-13-532434 filed by Semeyon Gofman against Whittier Enterprise LLC and DOES 1-25. The request is to dismiss the entire action and all causes of action against the defendants. The form in…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY GENTINO, ROBERT
Date: May 29, 2014ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AS PREVAILING PARTY
Date: May 21, 2014DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 25, INCL.
Date: Nov 01, 2013CCP 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON
Date: Oct 17, 2013NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Jun 27, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2015 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-12-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 998 OFFER AND ACCEPTANCE ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY $10,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $5,000.00 ATTORNEY FEES, TOTAL JUDGMENT $15,000.00, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-10-2015 CONTINUED TO MAY-12-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 10, 2015 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-10-2015 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
October 07, 2014 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-07-2014 CONTINUED TO FEB-10-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SVETLANA M. SHIRONOVA RE: OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO ACCEPTED OFFER TO COMPROMISE AND COURT OURDER AWARDING THE ATTORNEY'S FEES OF FEBRUARY 3, 2014 FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
July 08, 2014 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-08-2014 CONTINUED TO OCT-07-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMAN'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AS PREVAILING PARTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SVETLANA M. SHIRINOVA RE OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION RE OSC, NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER, AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY GENTINO, ROBERT | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
May 21, 2014 | Tentative Ruling | Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Tax And/Or Strike DeftS Costs Matter on calendar for Wednesday, May 21, 2014, Line 9, PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMANs Motion To Tax And/Or Strike Defendants Costs. The motion to tax...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AS PREVAILING PARTY | |
May 21, 2014 | hearing |
Notice Of Motion For Attorney Fees
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
May 21, 2014 | hearing |
Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Tax And/Or Strike Deft'S Costs
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANTS WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, AND ALEX MESEONZNIK'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES IS DENIED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS OF RULING.) JUDGE: ERNEST H\. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, REPORTER: CAROL KAREN #8189. (302) | |
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMAN'S MOTION TO TAX AND/OR STRIKE DEFENDANT'S COSTS IS GRANTED AND DENIED IN PART. THE COURT DENIES THE MOTION AS TO THE $570 FILING AND REPORTER FEES. THE COURT GRANTS THE MOTION AS TO THE COURTCALL CHARGE. THAT IS A PROSCRIBED TELEPHONE CHARGE WITHIN THE MEANING OF CCP 1033.5(B)(3). (PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE A FORM OF ORDER.) JUDGE: ERNEST H\. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, REPORTER: CAROL KAREN #8189. (302) | |
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-21-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY SHIRINOVA AND REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES UNDER CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 218.5 FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
May 13, 2014 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON AS TO DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-13-2014 CONTINUED TO JUL-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 16, 2014 | Tentative Ruling | Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Tax And/Or Strike DeftS Costs Matter on calendar on Wednesday, April 16, 2014, Line 9, PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMANs Motion To Tax And/Or Strike DeftendantS Costs. The motion is c...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
April 16, 2014 | hearing |
Notice Of Motion For Attorney Fees
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
April 16, 2014 | hearing |
Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Tax And/Or Strike Deft'S Costs
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. DEFENDANTS WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC AND ALEX MESEONZNIK'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES IS CONTINUED TO MAY 21, 2014, ON THE COURT'S MOTION. JUDGE: ERNEST H\. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT ; COURT REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR # 5976 | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-16-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMAN'S MOTION TO TAX AND/OR STRIKE DEFTENDANT'S COSTS IS CONTINUED TO MAY 21, 2014, ON THE COURT'S MOTION. JUDGE: ERNEST H\. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT, NOT REPORTED. | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | REPLY SUPPORTING MTN FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC | |
April 03, 2014 | Tentative Ruling | Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Tax And/Or Strike DeftS Costs Matter on calendar for Thursday, April 3, 2014, Line 13, PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMANS Motion To Tax And/Or Strike Defendants Costs. Continued to Apr...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
April 03, 2014 | hearing |
Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Tax And/Or Strike Deft'S Costs
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMAN'S MOTION TO TAX AND/OR STRIKE DEFENDANT'S COSTS. NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. RULING: THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING: CONTINUED TO APRIL 16, 2014 TO GIVE OPPOSING PARTY THE OPPORTUNITY TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 2.6B. OPPOSING PARTY MUST DELIVER COURTESY COPIES OF THE OPPOSITION PAPERS TO DEPARTMENT 302, WITH A COVER LETTER STATING THE NEW HEARING DATE, NO LATER THAN APRIL 3, 2014 AT 4:00 PM OR THE MOTION WILL BE GRANTED. ANY EXHIBIT MUST BE SEPARATED BY AN EXHIBIT TAB PER CRC 3.1110(F). THE COURT HAS COURTESY COPIES OF THE MOVING PAPERS. JUDGE: ERNEST H\. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, NOT REPORTED. | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-03-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SHIRINOVA FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX AND/OR STRIKE COSTS; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GENTINO FILED BY DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC HEARING SET FOR APR-16-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-11-2014 CONTINUED TO MAY-13-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 11, 2014 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-11-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO TAX AND/OR STRIKE DEFT'S COSTS, PROOF OF SERVICE, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON HEARING SET FOR APR-03-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $794.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE FEB-10-2014, FILED BY DEFENDANT MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC | |
February 03, 2014 | Tentative Ruling | Mtn For Attorney Fees As Prevailing Party Matter on calendar for Monday, February 3, 2014, Line 15, PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMANS Motion For Attorney Fees As Prevailing Party. Granted. Plaintiff is the p...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMAN'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AS PREVAILING PARTY | |
February 03, 2014 | hearing |
Mtn For Attorney Fees As Prevailing Party
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, RULING - THE MATTER WAS NOT ARGUED. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMAN'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AS PREVAILING PARTY IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS THE PREVAILING PARTY UNDER CCP SEC. 1032. THEREFORE, PLAINTIFF IS ENTITLED TO RECOVER ATTORNEY'S FEES PROVIDED FOR BY STATUTE UNDER CCP SEC. 1033.5(A)(10). PURSUANT TO DORAN V. NORTH STATE GROCERY ((2006) 137 CAL.APP.4TH 484), PLAINTIFF IS NOT ENTITLED TO RECOVER ATTORNEY'S FEES UNDER THE LABOR CODE BECAUSE THE PLAIN LANGUAGE OF THE STATUTES REQUIRES A DETERMINATION OF LIABILITY. HOWEVER, THE PLAIN LANGUAGE OF GOVT. CODE SEC. 12965(B) DOES NOT REQUIRE SUCH A SHOWING. UNDER GOVT. CODE SEC. 12965(B), THE COURT IS GIVEN DISCRETION TO AWARD REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES TO THE PREVAILING PARTY. DEFENDANT SHALL PAY PLAINTIFF REASONABLE COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,000. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: A. JAMES ROBERTSON, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT ; COURT REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR # 5976 | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-03-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
January 15, 2014 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
January 08, 2014 | Tentative Ruling | Mtn For Attorney Fees As Prevailing Party Matter on Calendar for Wednesday, January 8, 2014, Line 16, PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMANS MOTION For Attorney Fees As Prevailing Party Continued to February 3, 2...
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
January 08, 2014 | hearing |
Mtn For Attorney Fees As Prevailing Party
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-08-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF SEMEYON GOFMAN'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AS PREVAILING PARTY IS CONTINUED TO FEBRUARY 3, 2014, TO GIVE OPPOSING PARTY THE OPPORTUNITY TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 2.6B. OPPOSING PARTY MUST DELIVER COURTESY COPIES OF THE OPPOSITION PAPERS TO DEPARTMENT 302, WITH A COVER LETTER STATING THE NEW HEARING DATE, NO LATER THAN JANUARY 8, 2014, AT 4:00 PM OR THE MOTION WILL BE GRANTED. ANY EXHIBIT MUST BE SEPARATED BY AN EXHIBIT TAB PER CRC 3.1110(F). THE COURT HAS COURTESY COPIES OF THE MOVING PAPERS. JUDGE: MARLA J\. MILLER, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, REPORTER: TONY VAUGHN, CSR #6185 | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY SHIRINOVA FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR MAR-11-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JAN-15-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GENTINO | |
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LODGING FEDERAL CASE IN OPPOS TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY DEFENDANT MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | MTN FOR ATTORNEY FEES AS PREVAILING PARTY, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON HEARING SET FOR JAN-08-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
November 27, 2013 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-27-2013 CONTINUED TO JAN-15-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC,. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 25, INCL. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON AS TO DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | CCP 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
September 13, 2013 | Tentative Ruling | DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT Matter on calendar for Friday, September 13, 2013, Line 19, DEFENDANTs WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC and ALEX MESEONZNIKs DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. Off calendar. The case settled. Any pa...
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
September 13, 2013 | hearing |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-13-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC AND ALEX MESEONZNIK'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR. THE CASE SETTLED. JUDGE: MARLA J\. MILLER, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: ANTHONY C. VAUGHN, CSR # 6185 =(302/MJM) | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY IN OPPOS TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON | |
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC HEARING SET FOR SEP-13-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON SERVED JUL-02-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON SERVED JUL-01-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GOFMAN, SEMEYON AS TO DEFENDANT WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY MESEONZNIK, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF WHITTIER ENTERPRISE LLC DOES 1 TO 25, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-27-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-26-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-12-2013 |